TYLORSTOWN WELFARE HALL LIMITED

Charity number: 1151259
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £74.02k £66.14k £183.25k £18.25k £122.31k
Total expenditure £77.42k £53.37k £58.55k £98.99k £69.83k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £23.00k