INDIA SHARE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
India Share continues to raise money through donations and a range of fund raising activities to carry through its objectives of promoting education, alleviating poverty and promoting good health in South India. It has aimed to improve its governance through training sessions for its trustees. Concerns Universe Foundation, a major beneficiary, was visited by trustees in 2016, 2017 and 2019.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Liverpool City
- Manchester City
- India
Governance
- 21 June 2013: Standard registration
- INDIA SHARE (Working name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Susan Elizabeth Owens | Trustee | 10 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jenny Riley | Trustee | 12 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Anne Cresswell | Trustee | 23 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
Ulka Gaitonde | Trustee | 11 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
JANE WYLDE | Trustee | 15 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
CATRIONA ROUSSEL | Trustee | 15 May 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.36k | £13.84k | £24.74k | £17.01k | £17.59k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.08k | £10.27k | £34.19k | £12.54k | £14.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 14 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 February 2024 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 18 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 03 SEP 2012 AS AMENDED ON 20/05/2013
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND PRESERVATION OF HEALTH AND RELIEF OF POVERTY IN INDIA, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY SUPPORTING THE WORK OF THE 'CONCERNS UNIVERSE FOUNDATION' INDIA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
1A Stockton Road
Chorlton
Manchester
M21 9FB
- Phone:
- 07880866439
- Email:
- indiashareemail@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window