NORTH HUDDERSFIELD LEARNING COMMUNITY

Charity number: 1151685
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £17.79k £4.01k £9.88k £0 £29.50k
Total expenditure £16.31k £6.29k £70 £471 £20.00k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £6.00k N/A N/A N/A £29.50k