THE FRIENDS OF UPPER WHARFEDALE FELL RESCUE ASSOCIATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The relief of suffering amongst persons and animals endangered by accidents or natural hazards primarily in Wharfedale, North Yorkshire and surrounding areas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 24 April 2013: CIO registration
- 13 September 2024: Removed (Removed by application)
- 13 September 2024: Funds transferred to 1083459 UPPER WHARFEDALE FELL RESCUE ASSOCIATION
- THE FRIENDS OF UWFRA (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.86k | £720 | £703 | £540 | £520 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £31 | £4.68k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 27 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 27 March 2024 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 21 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 21 February 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 26 February 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 10 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 10 August 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 23 February 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 23 February 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 24 Apr 2013
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND PRESERVE GOOD HEALTH AND TO RELIEVE SUFFERING AND DISTRESS AMONGST PERSONS AND ANIMALS ENDANGERED BY ACCIDENTS OR NATURAL HAZARDS, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO THE UPPER WHARFEDALE FELL RESCUE ASSOCIATION (UWFRA)
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window