Accounts and annual returns HORN OF AFRICA ACTION FOR DEVELOPMENT

Charity number: 1155224
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2022 30 June 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 30 June 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2021 29 July 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 29 July 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2020 31 July 2021 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 11 August 2021 12 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2019 29 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 29 July 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2018 26 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1813 days