PROCLAMATION ZAMBIA

Charity number: 1152619
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 22 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 22 April 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 19 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 19 August 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 05 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 05 April 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 03 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 18 June 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 17 February 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 17 February 2016 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)