PROCLAMATION ZAMBIA

Charity number: 1152619
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £170.50k £284.05k £252.60k £142.93k £152.72k
Total expenditure £130.48k £224.51k £275.71k £180.86k £140.80k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A