Financial history COUTTS CHARITABLE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1150784
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/04/2018 01/04/2019 01/04/2020 01/04/2021 01/04/2022
Total gross income £1.08m £94.34k £591.90k £316.28k £561.25k
Total expenditure £677.23k £824.91k £750.48k £876.71k £930.30k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.01m N/A £496.39k N/A £501.20k
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A £0 N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 N/A £0 N/A £0
Income - Endowments £0 N/A £0 N/A £0
Income - Investment £76.68k N/A £95.51k N/A £60.05k
Income - Other £0 N/A £0 N/A £0
Income - Legacies £0 N/A £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £677.23k N/A £686.18k N/A £930.30k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 N/A £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 N/A £0 N/A £6.91k
Expenditure - Grants institution £673.51k N/A £0 N/A £796.84k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A £64.30k N/A £0