Trustees COUTTS CHARITABLE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1150784
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Victoria Amedume Trustee 01 January 2023
None on record
Javid Canteenwala Trustee 01 January 2023
None on record
Lord Philip John Remnant Trustee 17 November 2022
THE CITY OF LONDON ENDOWMENT TRUST FOR ST PAUL'S CATHEDRAL
Received: On time
Linda Hamilton Urquhart Trustee 02 July 2022
None on record
Judith McNeill Trustee 02 July 2019
THE NATIONWIDE FOUNDATION
Overdue by 5 days
Laura Lines Trustee 02 July 2019
None on record
Rachel Alice Harrington Trustee 02 July 2019
None on record
Peter Gordon Flavel Trustee 19 September 2016
None on record
Alison Marie Rose-Slade Trustee 10 June 2015
None on record
Dr LINDA YUEH Trustee 15 May 2014
ST EDMUND HALL IN THE UNIVERSITY OF OXFORD
Received: On time
ROYAL COMMONWEALTH SOCIETY
Received: On time