THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PHILIPS, BIRCHENCLIFFE

Charity number: 1150600
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 25 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 25 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 14 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 14 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 31 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 31 August 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 14 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 14 September 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 14 September 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 27 April 2016 On time Download