THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PHILIPS, BIRCHENCLIFFE

Charity number: 1150600
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Wendy Jamieson Trustee 15 August 2018 None on record
Walter Anthony Pell Trustee 15 April 2018 None on record
Jane Valerie Carter Trustee 01 April 2017 None on record
MS VAL LORD Trustee 16 January 2013 None on record
Rev JOANNE HUSTWICK Chair 20 March 2017
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. CUTHBERT'S, BIRKBY Received: On time
Rachel Louise Clegg Trustee 02 April 2017 None on record
CHRISTOPHER LLEWELLYN JONES Trustee 16 January 2013 None on record
AUDREY SHAW Trustee 16 January 2013 None on record
SARAH JANE JONES Trustee 15 April 2018 None on record
Peter Mallinson Trustee 15 April 2018 None on record
KAREN HAIGH Trustee 16 January 2013 None on record