Trustees THE RESTART PROJECT

Charity number: 1151286
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Gemma Chiara Del Pozzo Trustee 01 January 2023
None on record
Norah Mary Lewis Trustee 01 January 2023
None on record
Tara Rae Carey Trustee 01 January 2023
None on record
Gordon Robert Fergus Trustee 01 January 2023
None on record
Alexandra Deschamps-Sonsino Trustee 22 September 2020
Mediale CIO
Received: On time
Karl Stefan Hall Trustee 22 September 2020
None on record
Friederike Hanisch Trustee 29 May 2019
None on record
James Carrigan Trustee 14 March 2019
None on record
Karien Bezuidenhout Trustee 24 October 2016
None on record
Mike Tuffrey Trustee 25 July 2016
None on record
Tim Gonzaga Trustee 25 July 2016
None on record