Financial history THE MARIPOSA TRUST

Charity number: 1151108
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2017 31/10/2018 31/10/2019 31/10/2020 31/10/2021
Total gross income £176.77k £261.94k £138.95k £62.51k £126.41k
Total expenditure £145.58k £160.64k £170.31k £117.73k £82.33k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A