DANCESYNDROME

Charity number: 1152664
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Christopher Robson Trustee 21 June 2018 None on record
Toni Ellen Nel Trustee 04 January 2019 None on record
CRISTINA BOWMAN Trustee 21 July 2018
CUMBRIA DOWN'S SYNDROME SUPPORT GROUP Overdue by 93 days
CUMBRIA PARENT CARER FORUM Received: 5 days late
DOWN SYNDROME SWIMMING GREAT BRITAIN Received: On time
Christopher Hatton Trustee 21 June 2018 None on record
Julie Nicholson Trustee 21 June 2018 None on record
SUSAN ELIZABETH BLACKWELL GRSM, ARCM Trustee 15 March 2013 None on record
Peter Pamphlett Trustee 04 June 2015 None on record
JENNIFER SUSAN BLACKWELL Trustee 15 March 2013 None on record
LYNN JAMES-JENKINSON Trustee 17 September 2015
MY LIFE MY WAY Received: On time
Cat Young Trustee 01 August 2020 None on record
Natasha Britton Trustee 01 August 2020 None on record
Victoria McCorkell Trustee 28 September 2017 None on record