Arthritis Support Leicestershire

Charity number: 1151899
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/10/2016 31/10/2017 31/10/2018 31/10/2019 31/10/2020
Total gross income £40.00k £21.01k £38.47k £22.62k £32.99k
Total expenditure £43.00k £30.46k £19.14k £22.63k £20.10k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £9.92k £0 £3.93k £3.11k £4.88k