Accounts and annual returns OXFORD STUDENT CONFERENCES

Charity number: 1151631
Charity reporting is overdue by 422 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2021 Overdue Overdue by 57 days
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 Overdue Overdue by 57 days
Annual return 31 May 2020 Overdue Overdue by 422 days
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 Overdue Overdue by 422 days
Annual return 31 May 2019 19 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2019 19 February 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 14 March 2018 11 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 14 March 2018 11 January 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2017 12 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2017 12 March 2018 On time Download Open in new window