OPEN DOOR (OXFORD)

Charity number: 1150626
Charity reporting is up to date (3 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2015 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019
Total gross income £7.88k £9.20k £7.31k £8.87k £11.32k
Total expenditure £10.41k £9.87k £10.69k £11.18k £11.31k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £2.46k