OPEN DOOR (OXFORD)

Charity number: 1150626
Charity reporting is up to date (3 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JUDY BOON Trustee 22 February 2013 None on record
Nigel Carter Trustee 20 February 2020 None on record
Samuel Perez Ramirez Trustee 20 February 2020 None on record
Hamed Eazadi Trustee 25 September 2014 None on record
HASSAN KHALIL Trustee 29 January 2013 None on record
Jane Luchford Trustee 01 January 2019 None on record
JO MOFFETT-LEVY Trustee 29 January 2013
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF NORTH HINKSEY WITH BOTLEY Received: On time
MELANIE BETHAN ELAINE GRIFFITHS Chair 29 January 2013 None on record
Shahina Chowdhury Trustee 20 February 2020 None on record