Accounts and annual returns THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CHRIST CHURCH MORETON

Charity number: 1152051
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 16 May 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 16 May 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 03 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 03 May 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 29 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 29 September 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 21 November 2019 21 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 21 November 2019 21 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 20 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 15 April 2018 On time Download Open in new window