Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CHRIST CHURCH MORETON

Charity number: 1152051
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

16 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Steve Eaves Chair 26 April 2015
None on record
PHILIP DAVID JONES Trustee 25 April 2021
None on record
CLAIR LIANNE CULLIGAN Trustee 25 April 2021
None on record
EILEEN CLAIRE HUGHES Trustee 25 April 2021
None on record
CAROL ELIZABETH ALLEN Trustee 25 April 2021
None on record
Jane Louise Fisher Trustee 25 April 2021
None on record
Lindsey Ann Lawrence Trustee 18 October 2020
None on record
Phil Raymond Trustee 18 October 2020
None on record
Gillian Hughes Trustee 18 October 2020
None on record
Julie Harris Trustee 18 October 2020
None on record
Rev Betty Ann Turner Trustee 29 August 2019
None on record
Jane Alison Matthews Trustee 28 April 2019
MORETON CHURCH OF ENGLAND SCHOOL CHARITY
Received: On time
Les Evans Trustee 29 April 2018
None on record
Debbi Stott Trustee 12 August 2014
None on record
BERYL LOUISE BLACKMAN Trustee 14 May 2013
None on record
LYNDA JONES Trustee 21 April 2013
CHRIST CHURCH SCHOOL ASSOCIATION
Received: On time