WAVENEY FOODBANK

Charity number: 1151679
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 04 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 04 August 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 15 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 15 August 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 22 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 08 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 10 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 10 September 2017 On time Download