WIMBLEDON AND DISTRICT SYNAGOGUE

Charity number: 1150678
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £773.61k £459.14k £480.36k £460.42k £516.79k
Total expenditure £423.21k £431.01k £461.95k £587.56k £448.93k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £719.52k N/A N/A N/A £59.64k
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities £52.68k N/A N/A N/A £25.45k
Income - Endowments £0 N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment £1.41k N/A N/A N/A £111
Income - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A £431.59k
Income - Legacies £0 N/A N/A N/A £670
Expenditure - Charitable activities £392.29k N/A N/A N/A £447.37k
Expenditure - Raising funds £30.92k N/A N/A N/A £1.56k
Expenditure - Governance £0 N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A £0