Baitul Ma'mur Jami Masjid & Bangladeshi Islamic Centre

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
MOSQUE AND COMMUNITY CENTRE SOCIAL CULTURAL AND RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES, LANGUAGE CLASSES AND RELIGIOUS STUDIES
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 23 September 2013: Standard registration
- BAITUL MA'MUR JAMIA MASJID AND BANGLADESHI ISLAMIC CENTRE (Previous name)
- ST JAMES JAMIA MASJID & BANGLADESHI ISLAMIC CENTRE (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MOHAMMAD LUTHFUR RAHMAN | Chair | 16 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
NAFAR AHMED | Trustee | 16 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
ABDUL KADIR | Trustee | 16 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
MUKITH MIAH | Trustee | 16 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
MUHAMMOD ABDUS SALAM | Trustee | 16 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
ABDUL AWAL | Trustee | 16 January 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/03/2020 | 30/03/2021 | 30/03/2022 | 30/03/2023 | 30/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £32.51k | £23.07k | £54.40k | £60.35k | £79.41k | |
|
Total expenditure | £30.76k | £20.65k | £31.39k | £44.86k | £62.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 March 2024 | 13 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2024 | 13 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 March 2023 | 25 April 2024 | 86 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2023 | 25 April 2024 | 86 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 March 2022 | 03 March 2023 | 32 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2022 | 03 March 2023 | 32 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 March 2021 | 22 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 March 2020 | 15 March 2021 | 44 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
30 March 2020
(These accounts |
15 March 2021 | 44 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 22 JUN 2012 AS AMENDED ON 01/12/2012 AS AMENDED ON 30/08/2013 AS AMENDED ON 24 FEB 2017 as amended on 31 Jul 2022
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ARE (A) TO ADVANCE THE ISLAMIC RELIGION IN NORTHAMPTON AND THE SURROUNDING AREA FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THROUGH THE HOLDING OF PRAYER MEETINGS, LECTURES, PUBLIC CELEBRATION OF RELIGIOUS FESTIVALS, PRODUCING AND/OR DISTRIBUTING LITERATURE ON ISLAM TO ENLIGHTEN OTHERS ABOUT THE ISLAMIC RELIGION. (B) TO PROMOTE THE RELIEF OF THE ELDERLY IN ANY MANNER WHICH NOW IS OR HEREAFTER MAY BE DEEMED BY LAW TO BE CHARITABLE IN AND AROUND NORTHAMPTON, IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION AND OPERATION OF DAY CARE FACILITIES FOR ELDERLY PEOPLE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Baitul Ma Mur Jamia Masjid
43 Argyle Street
NORTHAMPTON
NN5 5LJ
- Phone:
- 07984148897
- Email:
- secretary@bmjm.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window