Accounts and annual returns COLLAGE ARTS

Charity number: 1153366
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 26 October 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021

(These accounts
have been qualified)

26 October 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 28 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 28 October 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 14 December 2020 44 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 14 December 2020 44 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 01 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018

(These accounts
have been qualified)

01 October 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 29 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

29 October 2018 On time Download Open in new window