SEFTON STARS BASKETBALL CLUB

Charity number: 1154271
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2020 COVID filing extension granted
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 COVID filing extension granted
Annual return 30 April 2019 28 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 28 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 April 2018 22 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2018 22 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 April 2017 15 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2017 15 February 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 April 2016 07 March 2017 7 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2016 07 March 2017 7 days late Download