Financial history APOSTOLIC FAITH MISSION COVENTRY ASSEMBLY

Charity number: 1151295
Charity reporting is up to date (1 day late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £47.32k £70.30k £49.84k £45.59k £33.75k
Total expenditure £40.93k £60.93k £56.93k £29.98k £36.98k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £9.99k £3.79k