THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARYS, EASEBOURNE

Charity number: 1151500
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 08 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 08 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 01 November 2019 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 01 November 2019 1 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 20 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 20 September 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 22 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 21 September 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 30 April 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 01 October 2016 On time Download