MID CHESHIRE FOODBANK LTD

Charity number: 1151705
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £91.16k £111.99k £136.52k £159.12k £444.32k
Total expenditure £86.55k £106.83k £130.96k £144.26k £266.31k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £8.24k £5.50k £8.76k £7.00k £10.40k