THE KING'S ARMS CHURCH CAMBORNE TRUST

Charity number: 1150888
Charity reporting is up to date (1 day late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 01 February 2021 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 01 February 2021 1 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 05 February 2020 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 05 February 2020 5 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 31 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 11 June 2019 131 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 21 May 2018 110 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 21 May 2018 110 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 12 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 12 January 2017 On time Download