THE KING'S ARMS CHURCH CAMBORNE TRUST

Charity number: 1150888
Charity reporting is up to date (1 day late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £38.45k £48.63k £52.12k £39.06k £21.35k
Total expenditure £39.76k £44.21k £51.36k £35.47k £24.32k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A