ABERAVON SURF LIFE SAVING CLUB

Charity number: 1153019
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £38.40k £38.40k £40.68k £58.91k £57.92k
Total expenditure £42.74k £42.74k £39.44k £47.33k £38.92k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £4.94k £4.94k N/A £4.94k £34.94k