FRIENDS OF ST MARY'S, BOTTESFORD

Charity number: 1154917
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £7.97k £8.85k £9.63k £6.73k £4.22k
Total expenditure £5.87k £9.74k £4.29k £4.52k £539
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A