KHALSA INTERNATIONAL WELFARE SOCIETY

Charity number: 1152436
Charity reporting is overdue by 5 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2021 Overdue Overdue by 5 days
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2021 Overdue Overdue by 5 days
Annual return 31 January 2020 31 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 31 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 January 2019 31 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2019 31 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 January 2018 10 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2018 10 September 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 January 2017 04 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2017 04 October 2017 On time Download