Accounts and annual returns ALL-ABOARD! WATER SPORT AND WATER RECREATIONAL ACTIVITY (BRISTOL)

Charity number: 1151374
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 12 September 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 12 September 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 20 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 20 August 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 29 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 29 October 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 16 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 16 September 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 11 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 11 January 2019 On time Download Open in new window