Financial history FOREST RECYCLING PROJECT LIMITED

Charity number: 1151578
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £195.09k £178.10k £223.03k £216.46k £232.76k
Total expenditure £177.62k £166.18k £168.61k £181.46k £223.62k
Income from government contracts £5.45k £23.93k £23.87k £13.39k £16.86k
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £60.48k £12.87k