Accounts and annual returns REES FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1154019
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 07 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 07 October 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 12 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 12 October 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 29 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 29 August 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 15 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 15 August 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2016 21 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 21 August 2017 On time Download Open in new window