Accounts and annual returns BABY JAMES' STARLIGHT TRUST

Charity number: 1151570
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 November 2020 13 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2019 08 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2018 15 October 2019 15 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2017 08 November 2018 39 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2016 08 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2016 Not Required