HAMPSHIRE CRICKET FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote community participation in healthy recreation. To provide and assist in providing facilities for sport, recreation and other leisure time occupations. To advance the education of children and young people. And such charitable purposes for the public benefit as the trustees may determine.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Hampshire
- Isle Of Wight
Governance
- 14 May 2013: Standard registration
- HAMPSHIRE CRICKET COMMUNITY TRUST (Previous name)
- HAMPSHIRE CRICKET IN THE COMMUNITY (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NEIL TRESTRAIL | Chair | 12 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
Harry Gopal Kutty | Trustee | 08 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Carol Harwood | Trustee | 06 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Maximillian Jonas | Trustee | 06 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Donniya Amarjit Davies | Trustee | 24 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
BENJAMIN JAMES THOMPSON | Trustee | 28 February 2013 |
|
|
||||
DAVID MANN | Trustee | 28 February 2013 |
|
|
||||
RODERICK GRANVILLE BRANSGROVE | Trustee | 28 February 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £187.62k | £135.09k | £53.23k | £113.55k | £200.83k | |
|
Total expenditure | £149.47k | £178.69k | £82.53k | £73.64k | £81.19k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 03 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 03 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 25 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 05 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 05 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 January 2021 | 89 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 28 January 2021 | 89 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 14/12/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 14/05/2013 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 14/11/2013 as amended on 29 Oct 2019
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS") ARE, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC GENERALLY AND, IN PARTICULAR, THE INHABITANTS OF HAMPSHIRE AND ITS SURROUNDING AREAS; 1) TO PROMOTE COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION IN PARTICULAR BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR AND ORGANISING THE PLAYING OF CRICKET AND OTHER SPORT AND GAMES CAPABLE OF PROMOTING HEALTH ("FACILITIES" IN THIS ARTICLE MEANS LAND, BUILDINGS, EQUIPMENT, PERSONNEL AND KNOW-HOW); 2) TO PROVIDE AND ASSIST IN PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR SPORT, RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF SUCH PERSONS WHO HAVE NEED FOR SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, POVERTY OR SOCIAL ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITION OF LIFE; 3) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGH SUCH MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT; AND 4) SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AS ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
HAMPSHIRE ISLE OF WIGHT
Contact information
- Address:
-
Utilita Bowl
Botley Road
West End
Southampton
Hampshire
SO30 3XH
- Phone:
- 02380472002
- Email:
- community@ageasbowl.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window