RED ROSE RECOVERY LANCASHIRE

Charity number: 1152474
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 16 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 16 November 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 11 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 11 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 29 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 29 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 03 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 03 January 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 05 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 05 January 2017 On time Download