MEANWHILE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1151901
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 06 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 06 October 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 21 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 21 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 25 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 07 December 2018 37 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 03 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required