LONDON DISABILITY SWIMMING CLUB

Charity number: 1154351
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £3.23k £17.84k £12.54k £4.51k £2.35k
Total expenditure £4.77k £22.24k £4.33k £4.34k £2.71k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A