TUDOR ROSE MENTORING ACADEMY ADVANCING DIVERSITY UK

Charity number: 1152349
Charity reporting is overdue by 309 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 309 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 309 days
Annual return 31 March 2019 09 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 04 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 15 March 2018 43 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 15 March 2018 408 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required