AL HAYAT LANGUAGES LIMITED

Charity number: 1152346
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 30 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 30 July 2021 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2019 24 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 24 July 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2018 31 July 2019 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 31 July 2019 1 days late Download
Annual return 30 September 2017 25 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 25 July 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2016 11 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 11 July 2017 On time Download