COLCHESTER FOODBANK

Charity number: 1152387
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £49.51k £36.79k £76.79k £97.27k £393.65k
Total expenditure £44.52k £36.07k £41.58k £71.36k £143.69k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A £26.74k
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £14.40k