COLCHESTER FOODBANK

Charity number: 1152387
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Win Pomroy Trustee 11 October 2017 None on record
Richard Priest Trustee 17 January 2019 None on record
Mark Norrington Trustee 17 January 2019 None on record
Julie Rusiecki Trustee 26 January 2016 None on record
Joanne Santinelli Trustee 03 July 2019 None on record
Rev ANDREW IAN FORDYCE Chair 08 February 2013 None on record
Sir Bob Russell Trustee 02 September 2017 None on record
Rev Kenneth R Thom Trustee 02 March 2021 None on record
Rev CAROLINE Beckett Trustee 04 January 2017
'GIFTS FOR ROMANIA' Received: On time