LONDON FIREBIRD ORCHESTRA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of art and science of music through the management of an orchestra featuring musicians of the younger generation and the presentation of public concerts.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 28 February 2013: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stephen David Wilson | Trustee | 30 October 2024 |
|
|||||
James Christopher Saunders | Trustee | 30 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michael Manning Clark | Trustee | 05 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
Marc Corbett-Weaver | Trustee | 07 February 2013 |
|
|
||||
RORY GRAHAM | Trustee | 07 February 2013 |
|
|
||||
DAVID BATY | Trustee | 07 February 2013 |
|
|
||||
PHILIP EDWARD ROWLEY | Trustee | 07 February 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £66.37k | £35.05k | £56.80k | £70.40k | £83.67k | |
|
Total expenditure | £63.69k | £35.57k | £57.03k | £79.72k | £73.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 27 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | 27 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 23 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | 23 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 24 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | 24 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 30 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | 30 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 26 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | 26 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 07/02/2013
Charitable objects
4.1 THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING:(A)THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ARTS GENERALLY AND MUSIC PARTICULARLY, BY THE ESTABLISHMENT AND OPERATION OF AN ORCHESTRA (AND OTHER MUSICAL GROUPS AS APPROPRIATE FROM TIME TO TIME) AND:(I)THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC CONCERTS AND OTHER MUSICAL AND RELATED EVENTS FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC;AND(II)THE PRESENTATION OF EVENTS FUSING MUSIC WITH COMEDY AND OTHER ART-FORMS IN ORDER TO MAKE CLASSICAL MUSIC MORE ACCESSIBLE TO THOSE WHO MAY PREVIOUSLY HAVE FELT EXCLUDED;(B)THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, BY:(I)PRINCIPALLY INVOLVING IN THE ORCHESTRA YOUNG MUSICIANS AND RECENT GRADUATES FROM THE ROYAL ACADEMIES AND SIMILAR INSTITUTIONS, TO ENABLE THEM TO GAIN PRACTICAL EXPERIENCE OF PERFORMING IN PUBLIC AND AS PART OF AN ENSEMBLE; AND(II)PROVIDING AN INTRODUCTION TO MUSIC AND THE MAKING OF MUSIC TO CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN WORKSHOPS AND SIMILAR PARTICIPATIVE EVENTS;(C)THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, BY:(I)PROVIDING PRACTICAL AND FINANCIAL SUPPORT, INCLUDING GRANTS, BURSARIES AND SPONSORSHIP, TO YOUNG MUSICIANS OR THOSE PARTICIPATING IN MUSICAL EDUCATION OR TRAINING OR INSTITUTIONS OR BODIES PROVIDING SUCH EDUCATION OR TRAINING;AND(II)ESTABLISHING COMPETITIONS AND AWARDS FOR THOSE INVOLVED IN THE ORCHESTRA OR PARTICIPATING IN MUSICAL EDUCATION OR TRAINING.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
London Firebird Orchestra
18 Savile Row
London
W1S 3PW
- Phone:
- 07920282397
- Email:
- info@FirebirdOrchestra.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window