Accounts and annual returns UPFRONT ARTS

Charity number: 1153089
Charity reporting is up to date (3 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2021 02 August 2022 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 02 August 2022 3 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2020 30 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 30 June 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2019 03 August 2020 4 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 03 August 2020 4 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2018 18 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 18 July 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2017 25 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 25 July 2018 On time Download Open in new window