Financial history UPFRONT ARTS

Charity number: 1153089
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £60.65k £56.27k £62.52k £39.51k £53.72k
Total expenditure £98.33k £56.15k £71.57k £53.09k £46.18k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £2.81k N/A £10.00k