Trustees UPFRONT ARTS

Charity number: 1153089
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
LAURA MACALPIN HAMILTON Chair 30 October 2014
None on record
Katie Norman Trustee 20 May 2022
None on record
Marilyn Anne Baker Trustee 12 May 2022
WEST CUMBRIA U3A
Received: On time
Susan Allan PhD Trustee 12 May 2022
None on record
Sajdah Perven Ghafoor OBE Trustee 12 May 2022
None on record
Kevan Robert Baker Trustee 12 May 2022
None on record
Peter JohnColin Macqueen Trustee 12 May 2022
None on record
Alison McCaw Trustee 26 July 2019
None on record
Judith Clarke Trustee 22 April 2018
None on record
GWYNNE HUNT Trustee 08 September 2017
None on record