AMERSHAM A CAPPELLA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We advance, improve, develop and maintain public education in, and the appreciation of, the art and science of singing Barbershop Harmony in both chorus and quartet forms by any means the trustees see fit, including through the presentation of public concerts and recitals. This has included weekly rehearsals, National Competitions and public performances we have gained a number of new members.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
60 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Buckinghamshire
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 15 July 2013: Standard registration
- AAC (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Amanda Parker | Chair | 16 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Smith | Trustee | 18 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jennie Kirk | Trustee | 18 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jen Franklin | Trustee | 18 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Justine Louise Nye | Trustee | 18 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Lynne Carter Blencowe | Trustee | 18 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Claire Sweeney | Trustee | 16 January 2024 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £31.47k | £33.29k | £27.29k | £31.17k | £33.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £39.29k | £21.55k | £15.52k | £47.51k | £31.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 09 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | 09 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 01 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | 01 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 15 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | 15 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 13 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | 13 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 21 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | 21 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 22 JAN 2013 as amended on 05 Feb 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE SOCIETY SHALL BE: 1. TO ADVANCE, IMPROVE, DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION IN, AND APPRECIATION OF, THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC IN ALL ITS ASPECTS BY ANY MEANS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT, INCLUDING THROUGH THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC CONCERTS AND RECITALS; 2. TO FURTHER SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION SHALL THINK FIT BUT IN PARTICULAR THROUGH THE MAKING OF GRANTS AND DONATIONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Ever Green Lodge
Whipsnade
Dunstable
LU6 2LH
- Phone:
- 07584630804
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window